THE SEQUOIA TRUST

Charity number: 1090926
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1185 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1185 days
Annual return 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1550 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1550 days
Annual return 31 December 2015 28 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 27 October 2016 On time
Annual return 30 June 2014 30 April 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014 30 April 2015 On time
Annual return 30 June 2013 30 April 2014 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2013 Not Required