ALMA ROYALTON-KISCH TRUST

Charity number: 1088663
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.48k £7.82k £105.99k £794 £826
Total expenditure £6.73k £8.20k £6.10k £6.24k £14.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A