Financial history THE THOMLEY HALL CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1089224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £543.07k £587.95k £492.62k £585.21k £731.89k
Total expenditure £608.69k £558.02k £532.34k £475.26k £612.01k
Income from government contracts £19.79k £86.65k N/A N/A £23.00k
Income from government grants £66.87k N/A £24.60k £50.00k £52.41k
Income - Donations and legacies £453.16k £458.16k N/A £419.72k £453.99k
Income - Other trading activities £33.54k £51.43k N/A £61.09k £109.66k
Income - Charitable activities £56.37k £77.84k N/A £43.02k £73.33k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £754 £526 N/A £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A £61.38k £94.91k
Income - Legacies £5.00k £5.00k N/A £0 £368.94k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £503.07k £492.89k N/A £425.43k £557.03k
Expenditure - Raising funds £105.63k £65.14k N/A £49.83k £54.98k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £24.68k N/A £0 £30.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0