Financial history THE COLOSSI TRUST

Charity number: 1091634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £37.51k £43.13k £34.38k £26.26k £1
Total expenditure £27.80k £56.15k £34.90k £25.00k £4.20k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A