Financial history WELTON SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1089760
Charity reporting is overdue by 144 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £4.49k £1.93k £3.37k £14 £1.95k
Total expenditure £9.31k £5.80k £1.52k £1.02k £115
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A