Financial history HOPE AND HOMES FOR CHILDREN

Charity number: 1089490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £11.69m £9.12m £11.17m £12.15m £8.70m
Total expenditure £10.00m £12.38m £11.83m £10.28m £10.04m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £739.28k N/A £779.21k £1.19m £487.30k
Income - Donations and legacies £10.87m £8.08m £9.67m £10.35m £8.15m
Income - Other trading activities £10.02k £11.74k £10.65k £13.18k £12.52k
Income - Charitable activities £780.90k £1.01m £1.46m £1.68m £523.68k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.73k £3.99k £2.81k £1.46k £1.14k
Income - Other £29.91k £15.34k £14.84k £102.09k £17.15k
Income - Legacies £433.50k £574.82k £603.98k £89.69k £635.87k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.31m £9.36m £8.64m £8.14m £7.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.70m £3.02m £3.19m £2.13m £2.36m
Expenditure - Governance £120.06k £154.06k £77.33k £59.58k £55.77k
Expenditure - Grants institution £921.93k £964.29k £1.01m £1.14m £865.54k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0