Financial history CONCERN WORLDWIDE (UK)

Charity number: 1092236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £26.50m £34.38m £22.29m £27.40m £34.47m
Total expenditure £26.33m £35.53m £22.72m £28.00m £33.69m
Income from government contracts £227.94k £1.34m £1.86m £2.32m £2.63m
Income from government grants £18.54m £22.72m £12.65m £15.72m £21.88m
Income - Donations and legacies £7.39m £9.75m £6.85m £8.53m £9.39m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £67.92k £171.88k £278.82k £316.66k
Income - Charitable activities £19.11m £24.56m £15.26m £18.58m £24.70m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £864 £1.55k £4.45k £5.20k £3.33k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £859 £55.50k
Income - Legacies £438.83k £703.54k £501.82k £645.63k £785.96k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £23.74m £32.89m £19.79m £24.11m £29.78m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.59m £2.64m £2.93m £3.89m £3.90m
Expenditure - Governance £80.46k £82.27k £91.42k £87.12k £81.91k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0