Trustees CONCERN WORLDWIDE (UK)
Charity number: 1092236

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Margaret McCrea Sloan | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roisin McEvoy | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hugh David Ritchie | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Devlin | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Olufunke Akinboro | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Stones | Trustee | 14 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
George Milne | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Dunford | Trustee | 23 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Linda Horgan | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Diane Chilangwa Farmer | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Ann Sexton | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.