Financial history THE ARK (EAST HULL)

Charity number: 1092041
Charity reporting is overdue by 287 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £28.33k £5.92k £3.49k £0 £0
Total expenditure £38.57k £0 £10.00k £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A