ST PAUL'S PRIMARY SCHOOL (HOOK) PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1089714
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/08/2016 30/08/2017 30/08/2018 30/08/2019 30/08/2020
Total gross income £5.62k £7.69k £9.39k £10.59k £5.43k
Total expenditure £1.56k £25.49k £11.48k £6.42k £3.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A