LOOE DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1090558
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £70.72k £121.90k £80.59k £172.83k £62.13k
Total expenditure £70.80k £102.43k £87.85k £130.84k £94.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.15k £20.00k £1.50k N/A £1.50k