LOOE DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1090558

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STUART ASHBY-WRIGHT Trustee 19 October 2004 None on record
COLIN TREGEAR Trustee 20 May 2009 None on record
MALCOLM GARRINGTON Trustee 10 June 2006 None on record
ARMAND JEAN TOMS Trustee 05 May 2004
EAST AND WEST LOOE HARBOUR AND BRIDGE CHARITIES Received: 128 days late
LOOE SAVES THE DAY Overdue by 392 days
LOOE PUBLIC SCHOOLS AND EXHIBITION FOUNDATION Received: On time
JUSTIN GEORGE SPRECKLEY Chair 18 November 2003 None on record
Kim Blanche Spencer Trustee 18 February 2020 None on record
MICHAEL CHARLES MACARTNEY Trustee 17 April 2014 None on record