FOLKESTONE RAINBOW CENTRE

Charity number: 1096570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £393.14k £392.36k £382.90k £357.97k £318.01k
Total expenditure £316.08k £363.40k £387.16k £342.39k £235.62k
Income from government contracts £101.22k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £50.00k £164.12k £46.51k £20.00k £32.50k