FOLKESTONE RAINBOW CENTRE

Charity number: 1096570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER CHARLES EDWARDS Trustee 01 October 2017 None on record
DOROTHY DOUSE Trustee
KENT - EAST KENT FEDERATION OF WOMENS INSTITUTES Received: On time
THE ERNEST GEORGE WHITE SOCIETY Received: On time
NICHOLAS JOHN BUCKLEY Trustee 01 October 2017 None on record
Judith Doherty Trustee 20 July 2021 None on record
Sir William Robert Fittall Chair 01 December 2016
THE ROBERT THOMPSON CHARITIES AT SALTWOOD KENT Recently registered
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER & ST PAUL, SALTWOOD Received: On time
OLD PHAROSIANS ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Philip John Haines Trustee 01 April 2020 None on record
ELIZABETH JANE PETTERSEN Trustee 01 October 2017
PICKFORD TRUST Received: On time
THE DAVID PICKFORD CHARITABLE FOUNDATION Received: On time
BRIGHTER FUTURE INTERNATIONAL Recently registered
DR JEREMY COLIN RUSSELL Trustee 01 April 2016 None on record
Dr PETER LE FEUVRE Trustee 01 February 2016
Friends of the Anglican Province of Alexandria Received: On time