Accounts and annual returns SHAHFORAN MOSQUE AND ISLAMIC CENTRES (TRUST)

Charity number: 1098501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 09 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 09 November 2020 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 09 November 2020 70 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 09 November 2020 436 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 09 November 2020 436 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2017 24 September 2018 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 24 September 2018 389 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required