Financial history SHAHFORAN MOSQUE AND ISLAMIC CENTRES (TRUST)

Charity number: 1098501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £24.50k £24.25k £48.60k £51.00k £16.36k
Total expenditure £22.35k £22.30k £53.25k £57.49k £28.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A