Financial history THE PEOPLE'S EVANGELISTIC MISSION (NORTH SHIELDS) ENDOWED CHARITY

Charity number: 1091259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £26.07k £26.02k £25.04k £21.88k £21.53k
Total expenditure £15.91k £15.40k £10.67k £19.97k £11.73k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A