BOLTON WANDERERS COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1090753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jennifer Smith Trustee 15 March 2017 None on record
John McGinlay Trustee 07 June 2016 None on record
William Dawson Trustee 18 July 2017 None on record
William Henry Charles Webster Trustee 24 March 2021 None on record
Paul Holliday Trustee 18 October 2017 None on record
DAVE SINGLETON Chair
BOLTON LADS AND GIRLS CLUB LIMITED Received: On time
BOLTON COMMUNITY LEISURE Received: On time
Alan Walsh Trustee 19 July 2017 None on record
NORMA RUTHERFORD Trustee 24 May 2017 None on record
Marie Bisset Trustee 15 February 2017 None on record
Neil Alan Hart Trustee 22 September 2021 None on record
Bashir Jama Aideed Trustee 30 September 2020 None on record