TRUST LINKS LIMITED

Charity number: 1092324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £635.79k £584.97k £675.97k £880.72k £1.11m
Total expenditure £569.71k £577.91k £671.48k £837.45k £1.04m
Income from government contracts £95.00k £91.45k £150.00k £343.15k N/A
Income from government grants £67.00k £181.73k £50.00k £90.23k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £557.08k £343.57k £72.65k £50.85k £26.56k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £75.79k £239.53k £601.33k £827.38k £1.08m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.43k £1.87k £1.99k £2.48k £2.77k
Income - Other £479 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £569.43k £576.89k £663.12k £829.09k £1.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds £275 £0 £8.36k £0 £7.24k
Expenditure - Governance £2.75k £0 £2.88k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £1.01k £0 £8.36k £0