THE EMTHONJENI TRUST

Charity number: 1092880
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £7.41k £24.20k £50.70k £29.51k £10.32k
Total expenditure £18.77k £26.19k £47.84k £21.42k £19.07k