Financial history GLOBAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 1091657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £6.74m £5.81m £5.65m £4.49m £4.88m
Total expenditure £6.52m £6.02m £5.39m £3.35m £4.13m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £1.50m
Income - Donations and legacies £2.36m £2.68m £2.89m £3.11m £4.20m
Income - Other trading activities £1.55m £1.66m £2.34m £1.34m £675.48k
Income - Charitable activities £2.82m £1.47m £405.06k £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.97k £4.09k £16.70k £28.59k £10.10k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £10.00k £11.00k £9.34k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.55m £5.02m £4.23m £2.25m £3.38m
Expenditure - Raising funds £977.71k £995.68k £1.15m £1.11m £747.12k
Expenditure - Governance £9.24k £10.40k £15.28k £12.58k £10.49k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.31m £2.61m £287.00k £1.35m £2.36m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0