Trustees GLOBAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 1091657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanne Louise Kenrick Chair 01 March 2016
None on record
Jennifer Stubbs Trustee 10 December 2020
None on record
Shalni Sood Trustee 10 December 2020
None on record
Marcia Asare Trustee 10 December 2020
None on record
Martin Allen Trustee 10 December 2020
None on record
Sally Cairns Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Ulrika Madeleine Hogberg Trustee 18 July 2017
None on record
Michael Connole Trustee 23 March 2015
None on record
JONATHAN NORBURY Trustee 05 March 2015
THE OLD VIC ENDOWMENT TRUST
Received: On time
Gareth Andrewartha Trustee 21 October 2013
None on record