THE RESTORE HOPE MISSION (RHM CHARITY)

Charity number: 1096179
Charity reporting is overdue by 1792 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 331 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 331 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 697 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 697 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1062 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1062 days
Annual return 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1427 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1427 days
Annual return 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1792 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1792 days