THE RESTORE HOPE MISSION (RHM CHARITY)

Charity number: 1096179
Charity reporting is overdue by 1789 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013
Total gross income £7.11k £3.53k £5.48k £6.25k £4.51k
Total expenditure £7.11k £3.01k £2.32k £1.75k £3.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A