THE VINE TRUST WALSALL

Charity number: 1093838
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 July 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 08 July 2021 8 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 September 2020 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 05 September 2020 67 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 04 September 2019 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 04 September 2019 66 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 30 July 2018 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 30 July 2018 30 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 24 November 2017 147 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 24 November 2017 147 days late Download