Financial history FILTON COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1093551
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £104.49k £99.65k £97.40k £106.44k £82.29k
Total expenditure £99.49k £101.22k £88.79k £79.52k £69.16k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £20.00k £36.67k