Financial history COMMUNITY YOUTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1093293
Charity reporting is up to date (56 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £142.22k £102.74k £98.47k £113.34k £85.93k
Total expenditure £133.76k £130.48k £103.38k £100.83k £72.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.50k £0 £1.45k £943 £1.00k