Accounts and annual returns THE BIG GIVER CHARITY FUND

Charity number: 1100634
Charity reporting is overdue by 1550 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 89 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 89 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 455 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 455 days
Annual return 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 820 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 820 days
Annual return 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1185 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1185 days
Annual return 30 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1550 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1550 days