Financial history THE BIG GIVER CHARITY FUND

Charity number: 1100634
Charity reporting is overdue by 1551 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2013 30/04/2014 30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017
Total gross income £12.55k £20.80k £19.68k £21.90k £22.00k
Total expenditure £12.60k £20.90k £19.68k £21.80k £21.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0