Accounts and annual returns ARCOLA THEATRE PRODUCTION COMPANY

Charity number: 1108613
Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 111 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 111 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 April 2021 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 April 2021 61 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 01 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window