Financial history YARLSIDE PTA

Charity number: 1092614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £6.00k £6.51k £5.64k £5.06k £9.09k
Total expenditure £8.29k £1.63k £11.05k £2.07k £242
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A