THEIRWORLD

Charity number: 1092312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £3.77m £4.68m £3.40m £9.81m £8.57m
Total expenditure £3.87m £3.96m £3.70m £6.89m £5.87m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.75m £4.66m £3.35m £7.93m £5.91m
Income - Other trading activities £12.90k £16.80k £4.80k £1.85m £2.62m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £50.39k £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.42k £0 £0 £22.49k £34.69k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.86m £3.94m £3.65m £6.83m £5.82m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.99k £20.38k £49.13k £59.20k £45.22k
Expenditure - Governance £14.75k £22.91k £14.10k £22.44k £16.36k
Expenditure - Grants institution £264.90k £277.44k £501.28k £3.10m £2.02m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £2.25k £1.26k £2.32k £0 £1.36k