CHURCHES TOGETHER IN WILLENHALL

Charity number: 1093921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kerene Mckeown Trustee 15 October 2020 None on record
Geoffrey Leslie Ward Trustee 15 October 2020
ADAM OUTREACH PROJECT Received: On time
Caron Gobsill Trustee 14 December 2013 None on record
Mrs Kathryn MacMahon Trustee 19 July 2011
COMMUNICARE Received: On time
Leslie Westwood Trustee 25 January 2018 None on record
ROGER FREDERICK WILCOX Chair 13 December 2013
KRASIF AID Received: On time
COMMUNICARE Received: On time
Eileen Joy Wilcox Trustee 12 May 2015 None on record