KIDS CARE LONDON

Charity number: 1096406
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2015 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019
Total gross income £314.82k £351.31k £421.86k £414.58k £347.45k
Total expenditure £316.22k £352.29k £382.13k £409.13k £340.86k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £6.50k N/A