InspireAll Leisure & Family Support Services

Charity number: 1093653
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £18.89m £20.23m £20.09m £19.38m £17.59m
Total expenditure £18.48m £19.54m £20.47m £19.64m £17.43m
Income from government contracts £2.59m £3.96m £2.80m £3.43m £4.99m
Income from government grants £13.32k £4.26k £0 £32.32k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £70.02k £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £635.30k £585.69k £539.41k £489.32k £77.48k
Income - Charitable activities £18.25m £19.57m £19.55m £18.89m £17.51m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.09k £2.04k £1.50k £1.93k £10.07k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £17.83m £18.96m £19.94m £19.09m £17.36m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £575.00k £534.52k £550.62k £67.96k
Expenditure - Governance £19.90k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0