COMPUTER FRIENDLY ST ALBANS

Charity number: 1096433
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £15.90k £20.48k £26.80k £12.05k £14.84k
Total expenditure £17.93k £20.97k £10.05k £10.66k £11.32k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £0 £17.70k £4.75k N/A