Financial history THE AXE VALLEY COMMUNITY COLLEGE PARENT TEACHER FRIEND ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1094703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/09/2017 01/09/2018 01/09/2019 01/09/2020 01/09/2021
Total gross income £4.81k £2.83k £2.06k £1.75k £183
Total expenditure £3.95k £2.36k £4.76k £1.63k £3.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A