AFGHAN HUMAN RIGHTS ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1099550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 19/12/2015 19/12/2016 19/12/2017 19/12/2018 19/12/2019
Total gross income £12.31k £3.58k £858 £500 £1.00k
Total expenditure £8.73k £3.28k £852 £400 £800
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A