LITTLE MILTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1092878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £19.27k £19.46k £22.31k £19.72k £21.75k
Total expenditure £13.73k £14.88k £18.88k £14.07k £9.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £19.91k