Financial history Merlin Neuro Therapy Centre Ltd

Charity number: 1093691
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £510.25k £811.97k £588.43k £579.78k £748.65k
Total expenditure £679.76k £774.10k £724.86k £459.37k £455.82k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £4.38k N/A £49.52k £27.11k
Income - Donations and legacies £58.58k £456.15k £220.67k £445.73k £567.80k
Income - Other trading activities £146.54k £196.81k £180.97k £68.07k £90.49k
Income - Charitable activities £299.11k £156.53k £183.83k £65.96k £90.35k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.01k £2.47k £59 £17 £4
Income - Other £0 £0 £2.91k £3.61k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £35.72k £25.38k £8.11k £410.75k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £566.53k £565.14k £549.27k £375.29k £397.71k
Expenditure - Raising funds £113.23k £208.95k £175.59k £84.08k £58.12k
Expenditure - Governance £38.10k £52.16k £0 £0 £11.29k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0