Trustees Merlin Neuro Therapy Centre Ltd
Charity number: 1093691

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tom Sneddon | Chair | 15 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Phyall | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Allan Ward | Trustee | 24 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Gifford | Trustee | 04 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emma Campbell | Trustee | 07 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Michael James | Trustee | 19 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Judge Christpher Harvey Clark | Trustee | 16 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
SALLY-JANE COODE DL | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.