ST MARYS ASSOCIATION FOR SCHOOL & HOME SMASH

Charity number: 1093377
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 04 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 27 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required