ST MARYS ASSOCIATION FOR SCHOOL & HOME SMASH

Charity number: 1093377
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £14.83k £9.49k £14.43k £18.47k £5.81k
Total expenditure £13.41k £11.13k £11.88k £18.58k £10.46k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A