PRISONERS ABROAD

Charity number: 1093710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charles Atkinson MA FCA Trustee 04 July 2017 None on record
Nicholas Joseph Hamer Smart Trustee 24 September 2020
PRISON ADVICE AND CARE TRUST (PACT) Received: On time
Tim Hailes Trustee 12 December 2019 None on record
Naetha Uren Trustee 26 June 2018 None on record
Dean Harris Trustee 04 July 2019 None on record
Mary Louise Catterall Trustee 10 December 2015 None on record
Toby Rogers Trustee 04 July 2017 None on record
Emma Douglas Trustee 04 July 2019 None on record
Christine Ashley Trustee 10 December 2014 None on record
Lord David Edmund Neuberger Trustee 11 December 2017 None on record
Phil Maguire OBE Trustee 04 July 2019 None on record
Dr VIVIENNE HILARY NATHANSON Trustee 10 December 2015 None on record
NICHOLAS HARDWICK CBE Trustee 10 December 2015 None on record
NICHOLAS EDWARD TUCKER PRETTEJOHN Chair 07 December 2020
OPERA VENTURES Received: On time