Financial history THE CECIL GRANT FOUNDER'S TRUST FOR ST GEORGE'S SCHOOL

Charity number: 1094822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £149.00k £154.94k £157.11k £153.91k £158.35k
Total expenditure £144.84k £136.65k £154.17k £136.90k £135.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A