PAKISTAN AND KASHMIR WELFARE ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1093583
Charity reporting is overdue by 502 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 136 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 136 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 502 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 502 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 17 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 17 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 17 January 2018 351 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 17 January 2018 351 days late Download