PAKISTAN AND KASHMIR WELFARE ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1093583
Charity reporting is overdue by 504 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £47.92k £33.63k £36.77k £34.49k £37.00k
Total expenditure £39.82k £37.48k £35.60k £33.84k £36.92k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £27.24k £32.36k N/A