THE BARTIMAEUS CHRISTIAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1096372
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £5.41k £4.56k £103.37k £25.90k £0
Total expenditure £8.50k £12.00k £35.00k £74.00k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A