Trustees THE BRITISH ALLERGY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1094231
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katherine Sykes Trustee 17 June 2023
CAMPAIGN TO PROTECT RURAL ENGLAND, SUSSEX BRANCH CIO
Received: On time
Rachel Louise Carter Oldroyd Trustee 23 February 2023
None on record
Elizabeth Withers Trustee 24 November 2022
None on record
Dr Oyindamola Stephanie Kayode Trustee 24 November 2022
PERSONALISATION SUPPORT IN CAMDEN
Received: On time
Peter Luis Frampton Trustee 29 September 2022
None on record
Archna Tharani Trustee 10 June 2020
None on record
Gary Stiefel Trustee 28 May 2019
None on record
ROY DABY Trustee 25 October 2018
None on record
LYNNE PRITCHARD Trustee 14 November 2013
None on record