THE COLLEGE OF ST MARY MAGDALEN IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity number: 1142149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £18.22m £20.75m £20.53m £21.41m £19.61m
Total expenditure £17.31m £20.31m £20.98m £22.76m £19.61m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £299.00k £310.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.66m £4.13m £3.08m £2.38m £1.63m
Income - Other trading activities £4.61m £7.58m £8.28m £9.93m £9.00m
Income - Charitable activities £5.89m £6.13m £6.20m £6.40m £5.69m
Income - Endowments £2.15m £2.60m £1.65m £1.04m £581.00k
Income - Investment £2.88m £2.70m £2.73m £2.41m £2.77m
Income - Other £183.00k £209.00k £237.00k £296.00k £532.00k
Income - Legacies £1.23m £40.00k £614.00k £738.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.48m £12.07m £12.53m £14.55m £12.82m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.58m £3.23m £3.08m £3.06m £6.79m
Expenditure - Governance £44.00k £42.00k £40.00k £49.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £181.00k £182.00k £185.00k £194.00k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £1.87m £2.58m £2.33m £2.28m £2.01m
Expenditure - Other £3.25m £5.02m £5.37m £5.15m £0